|
09/19/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 478, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6646.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 6649.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 4876.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 5360.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2014
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|