California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2754 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 24, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill June 16, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014