|
07/03/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 51, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:05 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 1581.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 38. Noes 12. Page 1224.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Hall. Reconsideration granted. (Page 1224.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 12. Page 1225.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|