LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB277
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB277
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB277
Compare Versions
AB277 Chaptered July 3, 2013
AB277 Enrolled July 1, 2013
AB277 Amended March 21, 2013
AB277 Amended March 19, 2013
AB277 Introduced February 11, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB277 Chaptered July 3, 2013
AB277 Enrolled July 1, 2013
AB277 Amended March 21, 2013
AB277 Amended March 19, 2013
AB277 Introduced February 11, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare