|
10/08/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 629, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2244.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1713.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (February 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/04/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/03/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|