California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB30 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2013

Amended

Bill May 24, 2013
Bill January 24, 2013