|
08/13/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 96, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2284.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1606.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1121.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|