LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB306
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB306
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB306
Compare Versions
AB306 Chaptered August 13, 2013
AB306 Enrolled July 10, 2013
AB306 Amended May 29, 2013
AB306 Amended May 9, 2013
AB306 Introduced February 12, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB306 Chaptered August 13, 2013
AB306 Enrolled July 10, 2013
AB306 Amended May 29, 2013
AB306 Amended May 9, 2013
AB306 Introduced February 12, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare