|
10/02/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 496, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2768.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1975.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1580.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|