California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB308 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2013

Amended

Bill June 26, 2013
Bill May 20, 2013
Bill May 6, 2013
Bill March 19, 2013