|
10/12/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 767, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3195.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 15. Page 3217.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 2313.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 30. Page 1883.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1809.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 1722.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|