California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB325 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill May 29, 2013