|
10/07/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 611, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 3288.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (September 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3147.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Taken up without reference to file by unanimous consent. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 2237.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2013
|
Measure version as amended on September 3 corrected.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Measure version as amended on September 3 corrected.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 4. Page 1563.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|