California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB327 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 21, 2013
Bill August 12, 2013
Bill July 8, 2013
Bill April 23, 2013