Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lieu.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 3721.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (January 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|