LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB330
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB330
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB330
Compare Versions
AB330 Amended June 17, 2014
AB330 Amended May 23, 2014
AB330 Amended January 23, 2014
AB330 Amended January 9, 2014
AB330 Introduced February 13, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB330 Amended June 17, 2014
AB330 Amended May 23, 2014
AB330 Amended January 23, 2014
AB330 Amended January 9, 2014
AB330 Introduced February 13, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare