|
09/29/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 776, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6444.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6464.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4809.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 3683.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|