LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB337
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB337
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB337
Compare Versions
AB337 Chaptered September 29, 2014
AB337 Enrolled August 29, 2014
AB337 Amended August 14, 2014
AB337 Amended May 19, 2014
AB337 Amended January 14, 2014
AB337 Amended January 6, 2014
AB337 Amended March 19, 2013
AB337 Introduced February 13, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB337 Chaptered September 29, 2014
AB337 Enrolled August 29, 2014
AB337 Amended August 14, 2014
AB337 Amended May 19, 2014
AB337 Amended January 14, 2014
AB337 Amended January 6, 2014
AB337 Amended March 19, 2013
AB337 Introduced February 13, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare