|
09/09/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 292, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 2649.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 8. Page 1882.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 19. Page 1459.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1064.) (pending re-referral to the Com. on G.O.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|