LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB352
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB352
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB352
Compare Versions
AB352 Chaptered September 9, 2013
AB352 Enrolled August 27, 2013
AB352 Amended June 26, 2013
AB352 Amended June 13, 2013
AB352 Amended April 23, 2013
AB352 Introduced February 13, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB352 Chaptered September 9, 2013
AB352 Enrolled August 27, 2013
AB352 Amended June 26, 2013
AB352 Amended June 13, 2013
AB352 Amended April 23, 2013
AB352 Introduced February 13, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare