|
03/20/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 4, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:25 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4048.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2874.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (February 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3742.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23). Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|