California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB369 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2013

Enrolled

Bill March 12, 2014

Chaptered

Bill March 20, 2014

Amended

Bill February 18, 2014
Bill January 16, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014