California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB389 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2013

Amended

Bill July 11, 2013
Bill June 19, 2013
Bill April 11, 2013
Bill March 21, 2013