LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB389
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB389
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB389
Compare Versions
AB389 Chaptered October 10, 2013
AB389 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB389 Amended July 11, 2013
AB389 Amended June 19, 2013
AB389 Amended April 11, 2013
AB389 Amended March 21, 2013
AB389 Introduced February 15, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB389 Chaptered October 10, 2013
AB389 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB389 Amended July 11, 2013
AB389 Amended June 19, 2013
AB389 Amended April 11, 2013
AB389 Amended March 21, 2013
AB389 Introduced February 15, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare