|
09/27/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 6265.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4463.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 1153.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|