California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB400 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2014

Amended

Bill August 11, 2014
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill April 23, 2013