California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB401 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill September 5, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 22, 2013
Bill August 12, 2013
Bill May 20, 2013
Bill May 2, 2013
Bill April 22, 2013
Bill April 3, 2013