LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB401
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB401
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB401
Compare Versions
AB401 Chaptered October 5, 2013
AB401 Enrolled September 18, 2013
AB401 Amended September 6, 2013
AB401 Amended September 5, 2013
AB401 Amended September 3, 2013
AB401 Amended August 22, 2013
AB401 Amended August 12, 2013
AB401 Amended May 20, 2013
AB401 Amended May 2, 2013
AB401 Amended April 22, 2013
AB401 Amended April 3, 2013
AB401 Introduced February 15, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB401 Chaptered October 5, 2013
AB401 Enrolled September 18, 2013
AB401 Amended September 6, 2013
AB401 Amended September 5, 2013
AB401 Amended September 3, 2013
AB401 Amended August 22, 2013
AB401 Amended August 12, 2013
AB401 Amended May 20, 2013
AB401 Amended May 2, 2013
AB401 Amended April 22, 2013
AB401 Amended April 3, 2013
AB401 Introduced February 15, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare