|
10/04/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 550, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 13. Page 2770.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 1991.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 12. Page 1219.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|