California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB402 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2013

Amended

Bill June 27, 2013
Bill June 4, 2013