|
03/06/2014
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2013
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 3327.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 2396.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Joint Rule 61(a)(13) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2376.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 2389.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 19. Page 1449.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|