California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB411 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Amended

Bill September 11, 2013
Bill September 6, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill July 2, 2013
Bill June 6, 2013
Bill April 18, 2013
Bill April 9, 2013