Assembly
|
08/28/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4894.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (August 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2013
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1480.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|