California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB423 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2013

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 21, 2013
Bill August 13, 2013
Bill May 13, 2013
Bill April 9, 2013