Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 10). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 1741.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|