California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB440 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2013

Amended

Bill September 12, 2013
Bill September 6, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013