|
09/28/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 6537.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (August 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4554.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 996.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/20/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/19/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|