LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB46
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB46
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB46
Compare Versions
AB46 Enrolled August 29, 2014
AB46 Amended August 5, 2014
AB46 Amended June 25, 2014
AB46 Amended June 5, 2014
AB46 Amended April 28, 2014
AB46 Amended March 12, 2013
AB46 Introduced December 19, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB46 Enrolled August 29, 2014
AB46 Amended August 5, 2014
AB46 Amended June 25, 2014
AB46 Amended June 5, 2014
AB46 Amended April 28, 2014
AB46 Amended March 12, 2013
AB46 Introduced December 19, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare