California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB46 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/05/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 46AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 5, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 25, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 5, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 28, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 12, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Pan DECEMBER 19, 2012 An act to add Section 89227 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 46, as amended, Pan. California State University: online education. Existing law establishes the California State University, under the administration of the Trustees of the California State University, as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in this state. Under existing law, the California State University comprises 25 institutions of higher education throughout the state. Existing law requires the trustees to establish a series of uniform definitions for online education for the California State University on or before January 1, 2015, as specified. Existing law also requires the trustees to report performance data about online education to the Legislature on or before January 1, 2017, and every 2 years until 2021, and requires the trustees to report the performance data to the Legislative Analyst on or before January 1, 2017. Existing law further requires the Legislative Analyst to submit to the Legislature, on or before October 1, 2017, a status update regarding the university's implementation of these provisions and an assessment of the extent to which the university's online programs are operating in a manner consistent with legislative intent and statutory requirements. This bill would require the trustees to make available to the Academic Senate of the California State University and campus academic senates specified information relating to all matriculated students of the California State University who are enrolled in online courses, irrespective of whether the courses or programs in which they are enrolled are provided by faculty of the California State University or by another entity that is under contract with the university or one of its campuses. The bill would require this information to be provided in compliance with all relevant state and federal provisions of law safeguarding the privacy of the students involved. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 89227 is added to the Education Code, immediately following Section 89226, to read: 89227. (a) For purposes of providing a high-quality educational program and correlating student success, or a lack of student success, with resource use, demographic data, preparation, and mode of instruction, especially with respect to online education, the trustees shall make the information specified in subdivision (b) available, on paper or in electronic form, while complying with all relevant state and federal provisions of law safeguarding the privacy of the students involved, to the Academic Senate of the California State University and campus academic senates upon the request of the respective academic senate. (b) The information provided under this section shall relate to all matriculated students of the California State University enrolled in online courses, irrespective of whether the courses or programs in which they are enrolled are provided by faculty of the California State University or by another entity that is under contract with the California State University or with one of its campuses: (1) The number of students enrolled in online courses. (2) With respect to each major course of study, the course completion rates for online courses and for courses other than online courses. (3) The grades earned by each student enrolled in an online course. (4) The course completion rates for students who are enrolled in online courses. (5) Any data available relating to a student's use of university resources in connection with online coursework, including, but not necessarily limited to,  the use of computer terminals and other electronic equipment, library materials, or staff support time.   analytic data concerning access to course materials; access to linked materials; performance on quizzes, tests, or examinations; and interactions with faculty, mentors, coaches, and other students in the online course.  This data shall include any available information about the average amount of time it takes a student to complete an online assignment. (6) Any available demographic data relating to students enrolled in online courses, including, but not necessarily limited to, the ethnicity, socioeconomic status, and gender of those students, and the cumulative grade point averages of those students disaggregated by those demographic categories.