Senate | 08/30/2013 | Joint Rule 61(a)(12) suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 2. Page 2044.) | ||
Senate | 08/29/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 1790.) | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2013 | Read first time. To print. |