LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB478
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB478
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB478
Compare Versions
AB478 Chaptered September 27, 2013
AB478 Enrolled September 18, 2013
AB478 Amended September 3, 2013
AB478 Amended August 28, 2013
AB478 Introduced February 19, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB478 Chaptered September 27, 2013
AB478 Enrolled September 18, 2013
AB478 Amended September 3, 2013
AB478 Amended August 28, 2013
AB478 Introduced February 19, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare