California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB480 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2013

Amended

Bill June 25, 2013
Bill March 21, 2013