LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB480
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB480
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB480
Compare Versions
AB480 Chaptered September 30, 2013
AB480 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB480 Amended June 25, 2013
AB480 Amended March 21, 2013
AB480 Introduced February 19, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB480 Chaptered September 30, 2013
AB480 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB480 Amended June 25, 2013
AB480 Amended March 21, 2013
AB480 Introduced February 19, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare