|
08/26/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 132, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 2464.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 9. Page 1700.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 21. Page 1566.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|