California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB481 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 13, 2013

Chaptered

Bill August 26, 2013

Amended

Bill June 12, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013