Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1567.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|