California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB498 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2013

Amended

Bill September 5, 2013
Bill August 20, 2013
Bill June 20, 2013
Bill May 7, 2013
Bill April 23, 2013
Bill March 19, 2013