California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB501 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2013

Amended

Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 12, 2013
Bill July 10, 2013
Bill June 11, 2013
Bill May 13, 2013
Bill April 16, 2013