LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB501
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB501
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB501
Compare Versions
AB501 Chaptered September 27, 2013
AB501 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB501 Amended September 3, 2013
AB501 Amended August 12, 2013
AB501 Amended July 10, 2013
AB501 Amended June 11, 2013
AB501 Amended May 13, 2013
AB501 Amended April 16, 2013
AB501 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB501 Chaptered September 27, 2013
AB501 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB501 Amended September 3, 2013
AB501 Amended August 12, 2013
AB501 Amended July 10, 2013
AB501 Amended June 11, 2013
AB501 Amended May 13, 2013
AB501 Amended April 16, 2013
AB501 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare