|
09/19/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 445, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 6271.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 4610.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2014
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2014
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 4193.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 1744.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) . Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|